THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 16:59:46 PM
Mehta, Adi Erach
CPSO#:
28037
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
09 Sep 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:16 Nov 1978 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1974 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Feb 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Sep 1979 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 1983 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 1983 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 09 Sep 1983 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Sep 1983 |