THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 5:12:49 AM
Kalu, Uduma Onuka
CPSO#:
28035
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
30 Apr 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
03 Feb 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Ibo
Education: George Washington University, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Uduma Kalu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 9 2015
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:ODS
P.O. Box 2071
Sudbury, ON P3A 4R8
Telephone: 705-560-8461
Email: [email protected]
Date Received: 07 Apr 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:09 Jun 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1974 to 30 Jun 1975
Resident 1 - Comprehensive Internship
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1975 to 30 Jun 1976
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 3 - Gastroenterology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 4 - Gastroenterology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1974 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1976 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Feb 2015 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 03 Feb 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2015 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: April 30, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Kalu has agreed to resign from the College as of April 30, 2015 and has agreed never to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.