THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 6:14:00 AM
Nolan, Kevin Joseph Martin
CPSO#:
27985
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
06 Nov 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Queen's University, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:301 Monterey Drive
Ottawa, ON K2H 7B1
Date Received: 25 May 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:25 Nov 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Dec 1975 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 12 Oct 1977 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Nov 1978 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Nov 2014 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 06 Nov 2014 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2015 |