THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 5:18:46 AM
Haight, James Stratford Jackson
CPSO#:
27978
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
07 Dec 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
05 Aug 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, German, Italian
Education: University of Oxford Medical Sciences Di, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. James Haight Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 15 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:The medical files for each paitent are within their respective clinics:
The Polyclinic
2 Champagne Dr
Toronto ON M3J 2C5
The Albany Clinic
807 Broadview Ave
Toronto ON M4K 2P8
101 - 491 Eglington W
Toronto ON M5N 1A8
Date Received: 12 Dec 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:27 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 1974 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Dec 1975 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Aug 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Dec 2018 |