THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 2:31:46 AM
Hobart, Adrian Hector
CPSO#:
27937
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Aug 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Jun 1995
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: English Conjoint Board, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:06 Dec 1971 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1966 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1967 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Oct 1975 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 13 Apr 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 1992 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jun 1995 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Aug 2007 |