THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 18:12:33 PM
Allen, Angelita Rivera
CPSO#:
27905
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
10 Oct 1975
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Tagalog
Education: University of Santo Tomas Faculty of Med, 1962
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1969 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1971 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Oct 1975 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2008 |