THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 5:23:17 AM
Willis, Kenneth Richard
CPSO#:
27890
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
25 May 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Kenneth R. Willis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 13 2015
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:2005 Hollybrook Crescent, Ottawa, ON K1J 7Y5
Date Received: 04 May 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:15 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:17 Sep 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 02 Jan 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Respirology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1974 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Sep 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 May 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2016 |