THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 15:07:07 PM
Irwin, William Francis
CPSO#:
27857
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
24 Jan 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Edinburgh, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:288 Westdale Ave
Kingston, ON K7L 4S7
Date Received: 03 Jun 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Sep 1974 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Sep 1975 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Aug 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jul 1981 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 26 Aug 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jan 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |