THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 10:24:14 AM
Otoo, Andrew Amukwei
CPSO#:
27851
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
09 Aug 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Sep 1975
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Birmingham, 1965
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Medical records storage facility: Records management Ltd.
Paitents looking to obtain copies of their medical charts should contact toll free:
1-800-775-0093
www.recordsregistry.ca
or
13 - 1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 04 Jul 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 1975 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 26 Jan 1997 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 25 Feb 1997 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2022 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 10 Jun 1996
Summary:
In June 1996, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Otoo guilty of professional misconduct as defined in Ontario Regulation 548/90, as amended, in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to s. 29(33).
The Committee ordered the following penalty:
1. Dr. Otoo was to be reprimanded with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.
2. Dr. Otoo(s certificate of registration was to be suspended for a period of three months, commencing within 60 days of the Order becoming final.
3. The last two months of the suspension is to be suspended provided that Dr. Otoo complete at his own expense, to the satisfactory of the Registrar, within 8 months of the Order becoming final;
(a) The College(s course on communication skills with the particular emphasis on gender sensitivity and patient autonomy; and
(b) A dialogue with a medical ethecist acceptable to the Registrar for a minimum of five- two hour sessions, which sessions shall include counselling patients, who are victims of domestic abuse and the issue of the paternalism in the doctor/patient relationship.
4. A copy of the Committee(s reasons for decision is to be delivered to the provider of each course.
5. If the said conditions are not met within the said eight months, the remaining two months suspension shall be served starting no later than 8 months from the Order becoming final.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Aug 21, 1995