THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 2:43:13 AM
Carlos, Joseph Mercado
CPSO#:
27837
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
15 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
04 Dec 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Filipino
Education: University of Santo Tomas Faculty of Med, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph M. Carlos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Sep 1975 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Dec 2014 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 04 Dec 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee |
Effective: 24 Mar 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Jun 2015 |
Concerns
Source:
Discipline Committee
Active Date: June 15, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Carlos was referred to the Discipline Committee by Notice of Hearing dated November 13, 2014, on allegations of professional misconduct and incompetence. Effective June 15, 2015, Dr. Carlos has resigned from the College and has undertaken not to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. Dr. Carlos does not admit the allegations. Given Dr. Carlos' resignation and undertaking, the College has withdrawn the Notice of Hearing.