THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 4:54:11 AM
Lipinski, John Kenneth
CPSO#:
27826
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Jan 1980
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Jan 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
216 Carlton Street
Toronto ON M5A 2L1
Phone: (416) 926-0115
Fax: (416) 972-6709
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: J. Kenneth Lipinski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
British Columbia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:25 Nov 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN KENNETH LIPINSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIPINSKI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 1975 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 21 Aug 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jan 1980 |