THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 8:36:29 AM
Padilla, Paciencia
CPSO#:
27817
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
15 Jun 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
12 Sep 1975
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Filipino, Tagalog
Education: University of Santo Tomas Faculty of Med, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:01 Jan 1971 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Feb 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Sep 1975 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Jun 2007 |