THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 14:25:04 PM
Seaton, Trevor Leroy
CPSO#:
27810
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Sep 1975
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Sep 1975
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the West Indies, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2125 Wyecroft Road
Suite 4
Oakville ON L6L 5L7
Phone: (905) 465-9229
Fax: (905) 465-3883
Electoral District: 04
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records Management Ltd
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place
Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Tel: 1-800-775-0093
Fax: (647) 933 2904
Date Received: 25 Jul 2014
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Cayman Islands
Guyana
Jamaica
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:11 Mar 1975 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TREVOR LEROY SEATON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEATON is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Apr 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Sep 1975 |