THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 10:42:10 AM
Fakim, Abid
CPSO#:
27798
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
09 Aug 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
10 Sep 1975
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Irish Conjoint Board, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Abid Fakim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 16 2016
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:All medical records for Dr. Fakim's patients have been transferred to Dr. Shreyas Rana. Patients may contact Dr. Rana's office to complete a request form for Docudavit Solutions.The office address and contact information is as follows:
Suite 1 A
595 Ontario Road
Welland ON L3B 0B3
Phone: 905-735-5627
Fax: 905-735-5628
Date Received: 24 Jul 2015
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Mauritius
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1973 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1974 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 08 Sep 1975 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Sep 1975 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2016 |