THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 5:15:51 AM
Bogoch, Earl Raphael
CPSO#:
27797
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Feb 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Feb 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Suite 800
55 Queen Street East
Toronto ON M5C 1R6
Phone: (416) 864-5350
Fax: (416) 359-1601
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bridgepoint Hospital |
Toronto |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:22 Nov 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EARL RAPHAEL BOGOCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOGOCH is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Sep 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Apr 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jan 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 14 Jul 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Feb 1985 |