THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 2:37:45 AM
Hsuen, John Shan Chung
CPSO#:
27746
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Mar 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Sep 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English, Japanese
Education: University of Madras, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Hsuen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 17 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Medical records are stored with Records Management Ltd. Patients may phone:
1-800-775-0093 or email: [email protected].
Date Received: 07 Jun 2022
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Hong Kong S A R
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:05 Nov 1974 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jul 1975 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1975 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Sep 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Mar 2022 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: January 6, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. John Shan Chung Hsuen to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 18, 2021:
(a) I, Dr. Hsuen, consent to this Undertaking being posted on the Public Register.
(b) I, Dr. Hsuen, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (11)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
Effective March 1, 2022, Dr. Hsuen has voluntarily resigned from the College and has ceased to practice medicine in all jurisdictions. He has also agreed not to apply or reapply for registration to practice medicine in any jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)