THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 8:52:40 AM
Shelley, Wendy Elizabeth
CPSO#:
27735
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
20 Aug 1975
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:18 Jun 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1974 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 1975 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2013 |