THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 8:50:08 AM
Helman, Arthur Barry
CPSO#:
27666
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Jul 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Aug 1975
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Non-Binary
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Cape Town Faculty of Healt, 1965
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Arthur Helman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 11 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Eatonville Care Centre
420 The East Mall
Etobicoke, ON
M9B 3Z9
Date Received: 01 Jul 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 1974 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Aug 1975 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jul 2021 |