THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 17:38:30 PM
Bowdler, Ann Rogers
CPSO#:
27633
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
03 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
05 Sep 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records can be advised that charts remain with the clinic that Dr. Bowdler saw the patient at.
Date Received: 30 Jul 2013
Instructions/Address:Records will remain at the clinic where Dr. Bowdler saw the patient.
Date Received: 30 Jul 2013
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 1967 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 1975 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 10 Aug 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Sep 2017 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Jun 2019 |