THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/03/24 6:12:27 AM
Fabian, Werner Albert
CPSO#:
27610
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
25 Dec 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jul 1975
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
25-Dec-2022
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, German
Education: Eberhard Karls University at Tubingen, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1972 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Dec 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jul 1975 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 25 Dec 2022 |