Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 05 Jul 1982
Summary:
In July 1982, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Rajovic guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 60(3)(a) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1974, as amended, in that he had been found guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to practice. The Committee also found him incompetent, as defined in s. 60(4) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1974, as amended, in that he displayed in his professional care of a patient a lack of knowledge, skill or judgment or disregard for the welfare of the patient of a nature or to an extent that demonstrates he is unfit to continue in practice. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Rajovic(s licence to practice be revoked.
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 1983-07-21
Hearing Date(s): Jul 05, 1982
Application for Reinstatement
Decision Date: 03 Oct 1988
Decision: Application Denied
Application for Reinstatement
Decision Date: 28 Nov 1986
Decision: Application Denied
Application for Reinstatement
Decision Date: 11 Jun 1986
Decision: Application Denied
Application for Reinstatement
Decision Date: 24 Oct 1985
Decision: Application Denied
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 30 Jan 1980
Summary:
In January 1980, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Rajovic guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in Ontario Regulation 577/75, as amended, in that he contravened a provision of Part III of the Health Disciplines Act, 1974, as amended, the Health Insurance Act, 1972, or the regulations, contrary to s. 26(2); in that he charged a fee for services not performed, contrary to s. 26(14); and in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to s. 26(31). Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Rajovic be reprimanded; that he be fined the sum of $250.00, and that his licence to practice be suspended for a period of thirty days.
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 1981-01-22
Hearing Date(s): 28 Jan 1980