THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 13:19:57 PM
Rowlinson, Frederick Anthony
CPSO#:
27594
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Sep 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jul 1975
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: F. A. Rowlinson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1973 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jun 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 1975 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Sep 2021 |