THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:54:48 AM
Figueredo, Alvaro Tell
CPSO#:
27580
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
20 Dec 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
11 Mar 1974
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: University of the Republic, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. A. Figueredo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 27 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:07 Nov 1974 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Mar 1974 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jul 1975 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 20 Dec 2014 |