THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:37:45 AM
Whelan, Mervyn Richard
CPSO#:
27579
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
09 Aug 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
18 Dec 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1976 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 1975 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 22 Oct 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Dec 1990 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2016 |