THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 12:33:16 PM
O'Halloran, Patrick Joseph
CPSO#:
27482
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
04 Jan 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
24 Apr 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Patrick J. O'Halloran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 16 2016
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records Management Ltd
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place
Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
Tel: 1 800 775 0093
www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 04 Jan 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:09 Nov 1976 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1975 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Feb 1977 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Apr 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 04 Jan 2016 |