THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 10:38:56 AM
Lyons, Jerome Allan
CPSO#:
27472
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jan 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Jul 1975
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Jerome Lyons Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 7 2023
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:1) For electronic medical record requests from 2012 to the present, contact the Apple Tree Medical Group by visiting www.appletreemedicalgroup.com. Click on Patient Resources, click on Medical Chart Transfer and provide the required information.
2) For paper medical record requests prior to 2012, contact Docudavit Solutions at 1-888-781-9083 (phone), 1-888-297-9338 (fax), or via email at [email protected].
Date Received: 05 Jan 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1982 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1975 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jan 2023 |