THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 10:05:11 AM
Haukioja, Ari Heimo Olavi
CPSO#:
27405
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jun 1974
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
24 Jul 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Cobourg Clinic
44 University Avenue East
P O Box 86
Cobourg ON K9A 4K4
Phone: (905) 372-3323
Fax: (905) 372-3692
Electoral District: 06
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1974 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 1975 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Jul 2015 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 24 Jul 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 14 May 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 16 May 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 14 Oct 2020 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 09 Mar 2022 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
member |
Effective: 09 Mar 2022 |
|
Active |