THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 4:45:10 AM
Porter, Robert Charles
CPSO#:
27388
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
15 Aug 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
13 Mar 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Oct 1976 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1974 to 14 Jun 1975
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1975 to 14 Jun 1976
Resident 1 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1974 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 1975 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Nov 1977 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Mar 2006 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 15 Aug 2013 |