THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 3:23:17 AM
McKillop, Barry Allen
CPSO#:
27313
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jun 1975
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Jun 1975
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
67 Waterfront Cir
Collingwood ON L9Y 4Z2
Phone: 5194222714
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Arab Emirates
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:12 Nov 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BARRY ALLEN MCKILLOP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKILLOP is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Aug 2000
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1974 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1975 |