THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 4:25:32 AM
Holder, Douglas Allan
CPSO#:
27300
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Aug 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
12 Jun 1975
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Douglas A. Holder Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 21 2015
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:RSRS Inc., 111 St. Regis Crescent South, Toronto, ON, M3J 1Y6
Date Received: 27 May 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:06 Nov 1974 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:28 Nov 1974 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1975 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Aug 2016 |