THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 15:11:44 PM
Rabinovitch, Hyman Ephraim
CPSO#:
27293
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
22 Jan 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
17 Nov 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Hyman Rabinovitch Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 24 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: August 31, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On May 5, 2020, The Ottawa Hospital notified the College, pursuant to s. 33(c ) of the Public Hospital Act and s. 85.5(2) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that on April 28, 2020, Dr. Hyman Rabinovitch had provided written notice of his retirement from all clinical activities at the Ottawa Hospital as of August 31, 2020.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:06 Apr 1976 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jun 1975 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 22 Jan 2021 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: November 17, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Hyman Ephraim Rabinovitch to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 17, 2020:
A College investigation was initiated into whether Dr. Rabinovitch engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his neurology practice. During the investigation, Dr. Rabinovitch resigned from the College effective January 22, 2021 and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.