THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 3:48:27 AM
Chuang, Sylvester Ho-Sum
CPSO#:
27267
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jan 1977
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jan 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5477
Fax: (416) 813-5471
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Quebec
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:13 Mar 1978 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SYLVESTER HO-SUM CHUANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUANG is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 May 1975 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1976 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jan 1977 |