THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 14:05:44 PM
Manuel, Mogamat Arifie
CPSO#:
27255
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
12 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
05 May 1975
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Cape Town Faculty of Healt, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: M. Arifie Manuel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 24 2017
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill ON L4C 9M7
Date Received: 12 Jun 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:06 Nov 1975 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 1974 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 May 1975 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 12 Jun 2017 |