THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 8:01:29 AM
Grant, Frederick Curry
CPSO#:
27217
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
12 Apr 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Mar 1975
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:05 Nov 1975 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:28 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1971 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1972 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Mar 1975 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 12 Apr 2023 |