THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 14:56:14 PM
Simmons, Elizabeth Laura
CPSO#:
27210
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
21 Feb 1975
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:200-785 Wonderland Rd S.
London, Ontario
N6R 1M6
Date Received: 30 Apr 2020
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may write to:
Attn: Operating Room
Dr. Elizabeth Simmons
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa, ON
L1G 2B9
*Patients should indicate the date of their last visit to Dr. Simmons (that is how the records are arranged).
Date Received: 26 Oct 2011
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:01 Jan 1974 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Feb 1975 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |