THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 14:31:00 PM
Yung, Yick Shing
CPSO#:
27160
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Mar 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
23 Dec 1974
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English, Fuzhou, Mandarin
Education: University of New South Wales Faculty of, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Y.S. Yung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 12 2016
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St Regis Crescent S, Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 ext. 1
Fax: 416-398-5932
Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 26 Jun 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:10 Nov 1976 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1974 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Dec 1974 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Mar 2016 |