THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 20:16:30 PM
Bhatt, Devendra Shankerprasad
CPSO#:
27142
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Dec 1974
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Dec 1974
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati
Education: Makerere Univ, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
16 O'Brien Street
Suite 202 B
Orillia ON L3V 5S2
Phone: 705-325-4414
Fax: 705-417-1689
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Devendra S. Bhatt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 20 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital |
Orillia |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:09 Jun 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DEVENDRA SHANKERPRASAD BHATT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHATT is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Nov 1972 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Nov 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Dec 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Dec 1974 |