THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 3:00:55 AM
Gordon, Michael
CPSO#:
27132
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jan 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jan 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew
Education: University of St. Andrews, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
62 Appian Dr
North York ON M2J 2P9
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:06 Nov 1974 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:30 Nov 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL GORDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GORDON is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1973 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Nov 1974 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 28 Sep 2021 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jan 2023 |