THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 9:54:11 AM
Korda, Andrew
CPSO#:
26994
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Sep 1974
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jun 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1294 Weston Road
Toronto ON M6M 4R3
Phone: (416) 243-0700
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
West Park Healthcare Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1979 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDREW KORDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KORDA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1973 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Sep 1974 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Nov 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1985 |