THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 11:53:35 AM
Kelly, Francis Bernard
CPSO#:
26963
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
15 Jun 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Oct 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 1973 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Jun 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Sep 1974 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 22 Jan 1975 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Mar 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Jan 1977 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Dec 1986 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 1991 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Jun 2012 |