THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 18:31:27 PM
Luck, Geoffrey Michael
CPSO#:
26954
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
20 Nov 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Aug 1974
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
20-Nov-2023
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the West Indies, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Geoffrey Luck Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 20 2017
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Oshawa Clinic
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON L1H 1B9
Date Received: 10 May 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1977 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 1974 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2017 |