THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 0:01:14 AM
Jaward, Mohamed Asenkudhoos Abdul
CPSO#:
26906
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
23 Dec 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
12 Aug 1974
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Sheffield University School of Medicine, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Jaward Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 19 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:05 Nov 1974 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Oct 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 1974 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 23 Dec 2016 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: December 23, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Mohamed Asenkudhoos Abdul Jaward to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 23, 2016:
Dr. Jaward was the subject of College investigations into his diagnostic radiology practice. During the investigations, Dr. Jaward resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. As a result, the investigations were terminated.
Download Full Document (PDF)