THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 20:13:33 PM
Nguyen, San Duy
CPSO#:
26897
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Aug 1974
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Vietnamese
Education: University of Saigon, 1960
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: San Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 10 2021
Corporation Name: Dr. San Duy Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 28 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:01 Jan 1973 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 1974 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2023 |