THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 17:10:25 PM
Moulin, Dwight Emmerson
CPSO#:
26896
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Sep 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Sep 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
800 Commissioners Rd E
Room A1-146
London Regional Cancer Program
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: 519 685 8661
Fax: 519 685 8619
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:07 Dec 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DWIGHT EMMERSON MOULIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOULIN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1973 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 1974 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Nov 1979 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Feb 1983 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Sep 1985 |