THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 20:00:07 PM
Anand, Parvesh Kumar
CPSO#:
26818
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
26 Mar 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
10 Apr 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Lucknow, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Parvesh Anand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 6 2017
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Newfoundland and Labrador
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:07 Nov 1974 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 1974 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Feb 1985 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Feb 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Oct 1992 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Apr 2015 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 10 Apr 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 26 Mar 2016 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 23 Feb 1989
Summary:
In February 1989, Dr. Anand pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(21) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. The Discipline Committee accepted this plea, and found Dr. Anand guilty of professional misconduct. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Anand be reprimanded, with the fact of reprimand to be recorded on the Register. The Committee further ruled that a restriction be imposed on the Doctor's licence, such that he be prohibited from practicing medicine except under supervision in his present course of studies in vascular surgery and critical care medicine, or in another course in an approved medical school. It was stipulated that this restriction be in place until such time as Dr. Anand successfully completed the course he was currently taking in vascular surgery, until he completed a further year of remedial training in general surgery in a centre approved by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada, and until the quarterly In-Training Evaluation Reports demonstrated to the satisfaction of the Registrar that the Doctor's performance was satisfactory. Lastly, the Committee ordered that the restriction on Dr. Anand's licence be recorded on the Register. In a further hearing on 8 January 1992, the Discipline Committee varied the penalty imposed on Dr. Anand to require that he undertake refresher training in general surgery for a further period of six months at an appropriate teaching hospital satisfactory to the Registrar, after which his Certificate of Registration would be restored without restriction, provided that he supplied the Registrar with a written opinion from a senior surgeon stating that he could independently assess and deal with emergency situations in an acceptable and standard manner.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 23 Feb 1989
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: March 26, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Parvesh Kumar Anand to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 26, 2016:
Dr. Anand was the subject of a College investigation into allegations that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Anand has ceased to engage in the performance of any and all surgical procedures including office-based surgical procedures. In addition, Dr. Anand has undertaken to resign from the College effective March 26, 2016, and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
See PDF for full Undertaking.
Download Full Document (PDF)