THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 0:00:06 AM
Lee, Michael Shun Wai
CPSO#:
26812
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
17 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
26 Jul 1974
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
27-Mar-2017
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, Univers, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Please contact Dr. Pare for medical record inquiries.
Suite 403
265 Yorkland Boulevard
Toronto, ON M2J 5C7
Tel: 416 229 2399
Fax: 416 229 9771
Date Received: 20 Jul 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:19 Nov 1973 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jul 1974 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 17 Jun 2016 |