THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 17:25:44 PM
Nandy, Ranendu
CPSO#:
26811
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
25 Nov 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
26 Jul 1974
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Patna University, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Ranendu Nandy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 12 2020
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Etobicoke Medical Centre
85 The East Mall
Toronto, ON M9B 3Z9
Date Received: 25 Nov 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Sep 1971 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jul 1974 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 25 Nov 2019 |