THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 22:59:21 PM
Brown, Stanley Edward
CPSO#:
26738
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
19 Dec 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:105-641 Commissioners Road E
London ON N6C 5S8
Date Received: 30 Apr 2019
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking access to their records can contact: 105 - 641 Commissioners Rd. E., London, ON, N6C 2T9. Tel: (519) 686-8585.
Date Received: 29 Apr 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:13 Mar 1978 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1973 to 14 Jun 1974
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1974 to 30 Jun 1975
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 May 1973 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 1974 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 May 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Dec 1997 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2019 |