THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 17:47:05 PM
Zener, Shery Helen Kales
CPSO#:
26713
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Jul 1974
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jul 1974
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Yiddish
Education: University of Toronto, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Room 513- H Wing- 5th Floor
Toronto ON M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6580 Ext. 7742
Fax: 416-469-6805
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:20 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Psychiatry |
Effective:21 Sep 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHERY HELEN KALES ZENER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZENER is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1973 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Jun 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 1974 |