THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 16:21:03 PM
Grossman, Ronald Frank
CPSO#:
26679
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Jul 1974
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jul 1974
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON L5M 2V8
Phone: (905) 828-5168
Fax: 905-828-0113
Electoral District: 05
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:For medical records from 2300 Eglinton Ave West in Mississauga ON Patients seeking access to a copy or transfer of their medical record can contact Records Management Ltd. Telephone: 1-800-775-0093
Date Received: 01 Aug 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Baycrest Hospital |
Toronto |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:14 Nov 1977 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:28 Jan 2016 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RONALD FRANK GROSSMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GROSSMAN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1973 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Jun 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1974 |